GEC US 1 LLC et al v. Frontier Renewables LLC

Plaintiff: GEC US 1 LLC, AS (WRIGHT) LLC and ACTIV SOLAR HOLDINGS (US) INC.
Defendant: Frontier Renewables LLC
3rd_party_defendant: Activ Solar GmbH, ACTIV SOLAR (UK) LTD, COLIN BENT, KAVEH ERTEFAI, KIM KOEHLER and Green Evolution Capital LLP
Case Number: 3:2016cv01276
Filed: March 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2017 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ;denying 154 Frontier's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 176 AS(Wright)'s Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
November 22, 2016 145 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*]. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/22/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
October 26, 2016 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 132 Administrative Motion re Incorrectly Filed Document. The Clerk is directed to permanently lock Docket Entries 130-7, 130-8, and 130-9 in the ECF System (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016) Modified on 10/26/2016 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2016 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: granting 94 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 102 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
June 21, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/21/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
June 20, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing re selection of private mediator is set for Friday, 7/15/2016 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/20/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 16, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; denying request for an expedited hearing under Rule 57. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
April 28, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DIVERSITY OF CITIZENSHIP; CONTINUING HEARING. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/13/2016 09:01 AM. Response filed 5/6/16. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/28/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 18, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DIVERSITY OF CITIZENSHIP Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/29/2016 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 4/25/2016. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/18/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GEC US 1 LLC et al v. Frontier Renewables LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEC US 1 LLC
Represented By: Chuan Cheng
Represented By: Meryl Macklin
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AS (WRIGHT) LLC
Represented By: Chuan Cheng
Represented By: Meryl Macklin
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACTIV SOLAR HOLDINGS (US) INC.
Represented By: Chuan Cheng
Represented By: Meryl Macklin
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Renewables LLC
Represented By: Harmeet K. Dhillon
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Activ Solar GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: ACTIV SOLAR (UK) LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: COLIN BENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: KAVEH ERTEFAI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: KIM KOEHLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Green Evolution Capital LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?