Hundal et al v. Eagle Vista Equities LLC et al

Plaintiff: Preetinder K Hundal and Nishan S Hundal
Defendant: Eagle Vista Equities LLC, PLM Loan Management Services, Inc. and Alice Glazer
Case Number: 3:2016cv01287
Filed: March 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLM'S MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. This case is REMANDED to the California Superior Court, County of Alameda. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/8/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
September 2, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge William H. Orrick granting 38 , 39 , 41 Motions to Dismiss. All claims are dismissed with leave to amend, except for the Hundals' request for cancellation of th e Trustee's Deed Upon Sale and reinstatement of their title in the Property, which is dismissed without leave to amend. Eagle Vista is DISMISSED from this action WITH PREJUDICE. The Hundals shall file their third amended complaint, if any, within 20 days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
June 28, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING HEARING - Reset Deadlines as to 41 MOTION to Dismiss, 38 Second MOTION to Dismiss, 39 Second MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/5/2016. Replies due by 8/1/2016. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/28/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
May 23, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON {6], 8 MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge 05/23/2016. The Hundals shall file their second amended complaint, if any, within 20 days of the date of this Order. Absent agreement by the parties, all defendants shall respond to the second amended complaint within 14 days of being served with it. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
April 29, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MAY 4, 2016 HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion hearing VACATED. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/29/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hundal et al v. Eagle Vista Equities LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preetinder K Hundal
Represented By: Glenn Lee Moss
Represented By: Ann Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nishan S Hundal
Represented By: Glenn Lee Moss
Represented By: Ann Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Vista Equities LLC
Represented By: Julie Marianne Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLM Loan Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Brady
Represented By: Robin Prema Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?