Pell V. United States of America

Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Pell
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2016cv01291
Filed: March 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Kenneth Wayne Pell filed by Kenneth Wayne Pell. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
July 1, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. ADR Stipulation or Show Cause Response due by 7/8/2016. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/14/2016 at 2:00 PM. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 8/1/2016. Fact discovery cut-off 3/31/2017. Expert disclosures 4/21/2017. Expert rebuttal 5/12/2017. Expert discovery cut-off 5/26/2017. Deadline to file dispositive motions 6/16/2017. Pretrial conference statement due 8/29/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 10/2/2017 - 10/10/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 1, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
May 9, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 9 Stipulation filed by Kenneth Wayne Pell, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Case Management Statement due by 7/19/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/9/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pell V. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Pell
Represented By: Lia Trelease Marks
Represented By: Charles K McCotter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?