Crawford v. City and County of San Francisco
Plaintiff: Willie Crawford
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2016cv01301
Filed: March 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS' FEES MOTION by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 34 Motion for Attorney Fees. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON 13 MOTION TO STRIKE AND 18 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (granting in part and denying in part 13 ; granting 18 ). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016) Modified on 6/22/2016 to correct text (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER 26 selecting Mediation by Willie Crawford and City and County of San Francisco filed by Willie Crawford. Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/8/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/11/16. The Order has been amended to include the time of hearing. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE re 8 Order Reassigning Case. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/5/16. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Crawford
Represented By: Brian E. Soriano
Represented By: Vladislav Peter Viltman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Kevin P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Linda Margaret Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?