Strumlauf et al v. Starbucks Corporation Featured Case

Plaintiff: Siera Strumlauf and Benjamin Robles
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv01306
Filed: March 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2016 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Benjamin Robles, Siera Strumlauf.. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 17, 2016 5 Summons Issued as to Starbucks Corporation. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2016. Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 16, 2016 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 3/30/2016. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 2 Proposed Summons. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 1 COMPLAINT against Starbucks Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10295678.). Filed bySiera Strumlauf, Benjamin Robles. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strumlauf et al v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siera Strumlauf
Represented By: Scott A. Bursor
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: John Hafemann
Represented By: Gerald R Healy
Represented By: Julia A. Luster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Robles
Represented By: Scott A. Bursor
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: John Hafemann
Represented By: Gerald R Healy
Represented By: Julia A. Luster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Robin Andrea Achen
Represented By: Robert James Guite
Represented By: Sascha Von Mende Henry
Represented By: Fred R. Puglisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?