Gaddy v. Townsend et al

Plaintiff: Michael John Gaddy
Defendant: M. Townsend, M. Voong and Sandoval
Case Number: 3:2016cv01319
Filed: March 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: PSLC MSH
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/16/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
September 20, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFFS 10 MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
July 14, 2016 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 9/12/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/14/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaddy v. Townsend et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael John Gaddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Voong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?