American General Life Insurance Company v. Burrell et al

Plaintiff: American General Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Antonio Burrell and Lesia Habte
Case Number: 3:2016cv01375
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED FOR REPEATED FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDERS. Show Cause Response due by 8/18/2017.Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on August 16, 2017. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
June 7, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING MAY 24, 2017 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on June 7, 2017. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
May 24, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ***CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 51 *** ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED. Show Cause Response due by 5/30/2017.Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on May 24, 2017. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017) Modified on 5/24/2017 (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American General Life Insurance Company v. Burrell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesia Habte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Lisa Silva Passalacqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?