State Farm General Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone LLC

Plaintiff: State Farm General Insurance Company
Defendant: Broan-Nutone LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv01383
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE AGAINST DEFENDANT BROAN-NUTONE LLC by Hon. William Alsup granting 17 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
July 13, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT [re 12 Notice (Other) filed by State Farm General Insurance Company]. ALL DEADLINES REMAIN ACTIVE AND IN PLACE UNTIL A DISMISSAL IS FILED. Case Management Conference will go forward tomorrow at 11:00 AM 7/14/2016. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/13/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
June 7, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 10 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm General Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm General Insurance Company
Represented By: David Dewart Brisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone LLC
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?