Oracle America, Inc. et al v. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company

Plaintiff: Oracle America, Inc. and Oracle International Corporation
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv01393
Filed: March 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2017 426 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 425 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 352 Stipulation and Order, RE: NON-PARTY DEPOSITION OF BETSY MCDEVITT filed by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle International Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 24, 2017 422 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 418 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY AFTER THE FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 24, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 3, 2017 352 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 348 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Discovery To Be Taken After The Fact Discovery Deadline filed by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle International Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 3, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
September 20, 2017 341 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 328 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Supplemental Protective Order Concerning Oracle Source Code filed by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle International Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
July 25, 2017 303 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER AND FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 231 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
May 26, 2017 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 207 Motion to Strike. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
April 24, 2017 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 143 Motion in Limine. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
February 16, 2017 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion to Strike. Amended Pleadings due by 3/2/2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
October 5, 2016 95 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadlines for Oracle's Motion to Strike HPE's Answer filed by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle International Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 5, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
August 16, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Documents and Electronically Stored Information filed by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle International Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
July 25, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 25, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 22, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Dismiss. Redacted version of Order. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
June 27, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 54 Stipulation Regarding ADR Process filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
May 6, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Case Scheduling filed by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle International Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 6, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 4, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 35 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 4, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oracle America, Inc. et al v. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oracle America, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Benjamin Campbell
Represented By: Dorian Estelle Daley
Represented By: Deborah Kay Miller
Represented By: Meaghan Parfitt Thomas-Kennedy
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Ross
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oracle International Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Benjamin Campbell
Represented By: Dorian Estelle Daley
Represented By: Deborah Kay Miller
Represented By: Meaghan Parfitt Thomas-Kennedy
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Ross
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Represented By: Lauren Margaret Blas
Represented By: Blaine H. Evanson
Represented By: Joseph Abraham Gorman
Represented By: Samuel G. Liversidge
Represented By: Jeffrey Todd Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?