Via Licensing Corporation v. Compal Electronics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Via Licensing Corporation
Defendant: Compal Electronics, Inc. and Auscom Engineering Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01409
Filed: March 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 47 Stipulation OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
September 15, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 37 Stipulation Regarding New Hearing Date on Defendant Compal Electronics, Inc.'s 29 Motion to Dismiss and Extension of Deadline for Defendant to File Reply to Plaintiff's 35 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
August 16, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 33 Stipulation re docket no. 29 MOTION to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
July 1, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Chang, Ya-Chiao. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 21, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 STIPULATION SETTING SCHEDULE ON RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT AND RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DATES. (terminating 11 ) Stipulation (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
April 6, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/24/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/6/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Via Licensing Corporation v. Compal Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Via Licensing Corporation
Represented By: Laura Kabler Oswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compal Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auscom Engineering Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?