craigslist, Inc. v. DealerCMO, Inc.

Plaintiff: craigslist, Inc.
Defendant: DealerCMO, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01451
Filed: March 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 31 Motion to Compel Supplemental Discovery Responses.(vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 13, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Deadline to Conduct Mediation. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/13/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
April 13, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Vince Chhabria. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/13/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: craigslist, Inc. v. DealerCMO, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: craigslist, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Barry
Represented By: Perry Joseph Viscounty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DealerCMO, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?