Terrill Johnson v. Q.E.D. Environmental Systems Inc.

Plaintiff: Terrill Johnson
Defendant: Q.E.D. Environmental Systems Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01454
Filed: March 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2017 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 90 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/17/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
June 5, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/05/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
May 3, 2017 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING QED'S MOTION TO DENY CLASS CERTIFICATION; GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL FLSA CERTIFICATION; DENYING QED'S MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS; AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge William H. Orrick denying 50 Motion for Sanctions; granting 53 Motion to Deny Certification of Class; granting in part 56 Motion for Conditional FLSA Certify Class. Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2017. Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
September 7, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 34 MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick. QED shall answer the Third Amended Complaint within 10 days. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
May 10, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Case Management Conference continued to 8/9/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco.(CMC and motion hearing set for 5/11/2016 are VACATED.) Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/10/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrill Johnson v. Q.E.D. Environmental Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrill Johnson
Represented By: Farrah Grant
Represented By: Thomas Alistair Segal
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q.E.D. Environmental Systems Inc.
Represented By: Amy S. Conners
Represented By: Sarah E. Crippen
Represented By: Clement L. Glynn
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?