Jones v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al

Plaintiff: Rosalind G. Jones
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and All Persons Unknown
Case Number: 3:2016cv01475
Filed: March 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 19 Stipulation to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
June 13, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING: 11 STIPULATION re Continuance of Case Management Conference and Extending Related Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/13/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
March 29, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/29/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalind G. Jones
Represented By: Jeremy Jon Alberts
Represented By: Batkhand Zoljargal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Brian Andrew Paino
Represented By: Dhruv Mohan Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Brian Andrew Paino
Represented By: Dhruv Mohan Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?