Jarell v. Amerigas Propane, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jimmie Jarell
Defendant: Amerigas Propane, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01481
Filed: March 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Jimmie Jarell. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 17, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
February 7, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER and POST-MEDIATION REPORT OF PROVISIONAL CLASS-ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Jimmie Jarell. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 7, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
November 1, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re [Proposed] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Amerigas Propane, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 1, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
September 19, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER 1 Joint Report Re Continuance Of Mediation Date; And 2 Stipulation To Continue Case Management Conference And Joint Case Management Statement filed by Amerigas Propane, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
July 13, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 18 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Amerigas Propane, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
June 16, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Jimmie Jarell. Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarell v. Amerigas Propane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Jarell
Represented By: Alice A. Kim
Represented By: Thomas Alistair Segal
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerigas Propane, Inc.
Represented By: Melinda S. Riechert
Represented By: Nancy Villarreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?