Spangler v. Selene Finance LP

Plaintiff: Camilla Spangler
Defendant: Selene Finance LP
Case Number: 3:2016cv01503
Filed: March 28, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED without leave to amend, and the case is dismissed with prejudice. The hearing scheduled for October 5, 2016 is VACATED. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/3/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
July 22, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 20 Motion to Dismiss. Spangler may file an amended complaint within 20 days of this Order. She is advised to only assert claims against defendants where there is a factual basis to do so. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
July 18, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/16/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spangler v. Selene Finance LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camilla Spangler
Represented By: Patricia Renee Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance LP
Represented By: Ronald M. Arlas
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?