Ananian v. Sabadell United Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Diane Ananian and David Ananian
Defendant: Sabadell United Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01535
Filed: March 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/6/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/26/2016. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
August 8, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 30 Order to Show Cause, Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/8/2016. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
July 25, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 31 Motion re: Kennan E. McClanahan to be deleted from the Court's Records as counsel for Defendant Sabadell United Bank, N.A. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 15, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/11/2016 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 7/28/2016. Deadline for filing proof of service 7/21/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/15/2016. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
June 23, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/23/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
May 11, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/11/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
April 5, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/5//2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ananian v. Sabadell United Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabadell United Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Keenan Edward McClenahan
Represented By: Keefe E Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Ananian
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ananian
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?