Levy v. Prevacus, Inc.

Plaintiff: Daniel E. Levy
Defendant: Prevacus, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01555
Filed: March 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 59 Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 7/27/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
April 10, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying Matthew W. Bennett's 41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Civil Local Rule 11-3. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
March 1, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting Defendants' 34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' response is due by 3/25/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
August 11, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Scheduling of Case Management Conference filed by Prevacus, Inc., Daniel E. Levy Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/11/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levy v. Prevacus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel E. Levy
Represented By: Richard James Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prevacus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?