Institute for Fisheries Resources et al v. Burwell et al
Plaintiff: Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Golden Gate Salmon Association, Kennebec Reborn, Friends of Merrymeeting Bay, Cascadia Wildlands, Center for Biological Diversity, Ecology Action Centre, Friends of the Earth, Food and Water Watch and Center for Food Safety
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell, Robert M Califf, United States Food and Drug Administration and United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Case Number: 3:2016cv01574
Filed: March 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 254 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 244 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment.(vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 198 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 145 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Thomas E. Price, Robert M Califf, United States Food and Drug Administration, Sylvia Mathews Burwell. Plaintiffs' Opp/Cross-Motion for Judgment on Pleadings d ue by 10/26/2018. Defendants' Reply/Opp to Pls. Cross-Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings due by 12/17/2018. Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings due by 1/14/2019. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on October 4, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 50 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.(vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 03/31/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Institute for Fisheries Resources et al v. Burwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Institute for Fisheries Resources
Represented By: Brettny Elaine Hardy
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Stephen Mashuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations
Represented By: Brettny Elaine Hardy
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Stephen Mashuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Gate Salmon Association
Represented By: Brettny Elaine Hardy
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Stephen Mashuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennebec Reborn
Represented By: Brettny Elaine Hardy
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Stephen Mashuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Merrymeeting Bay
Represented By: Brettny Elaine Hardy
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Stephen Mashuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cascadia Wildlands
Represented By: Brettny Elaine Hardy
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Stephen Mashuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Brettny Elaine Hardy
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Stephen Mashuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ecology Action Centre
Represented By: Brettny Elaine Hardy
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Stephen Mashuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth
Represented By: Brettny Elaine Hardy
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Stephen Mashuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Food and Water Watch
Represented By: Brettny Elaine Hardy
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Stephen Mashuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Food Safety
Represented By: Brettny Elaine Hardy
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Stephen Mashuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Represented By: Mary Margaret Englehart
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Represented By: Marissa Ann Piropato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M Califf
Represented By: Mary Margaret Englehart
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Represented By: Marissa Ann Piropato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Food and Drug Administration
Represented By: Mary Margaret Englehart
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Represented By: Marissa Ann Piropato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Mary Margaret Englehart
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Represented By: Marissa Ann Piropato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?