Andrew Lockhart et al v. Jay R. Delaney et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Lockhart and Lesley Lockhart
Defendant: Jay R Delaney and Kathleen M Delaney
Case Number: 3:2016cv01583
Filed: March 31, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/8/2017 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 5/25/2017. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/15/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
September 7, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/7/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
June 24, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating CMC and Ordering Supplemental Response. Status Report due by 7/8/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/24/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrew Lockhart et al v. Jay R. Delaney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Lockhart
Represented By: Jamil Louis White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesley Lockhart
Represented By: Jamil Louis White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay R Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?