Tami Weis v. Frances Barbour Melbostad

Plaintiff: Tami Weis
Defendant: Frances B Melbostad
Case Number: 3:2016cv01584
Filed: March 31, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2017; Close of Fact and Expert Discovery due by 8/18/2017; Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2018 03:00 PM; Jury Selection /Jury Trial (3-day) set for 2/26/2018 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/6/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
March 21, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 29 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
March 7, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr Granting 27 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
August 4, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT SANCTION COUNSEL FOR FAILING TO APPEAR. Show Cause Response due by 8/5/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/4/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
July 12, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/12/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
June 24, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference and Order to File Joint Case Management Conference Statement; Case Management Statement due by 7/7/2016; Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/24/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tami Weis v. Frances Barbour Melbostad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tami Weis
Represented By: Eliyahu yuli Kaplunovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances B Melbostad
Represented By: Colleen Suzanne Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?