Harms v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dale Norman Harms
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and National Default Servicing Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv01585
Filed: March 31, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/01/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 30, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING MEDIATION DATE AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - The Court ORDERS that the mediation occur prior to August 1, 2016. Case Management Conference continued to 8/23/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco (Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2016). Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/30/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
May 23, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/23/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
April 28, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Plaintiff and defendants' counsel shall participate in a telephone conference, to be scheduled by the ADR Unit as soon as possible but no later than June 10, 2016. The June 8, 2016 hearing and briefing schedule on defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings are VACATED. Dkt. No. 15. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/28/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harms v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Norman Harms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Marvin Belo Adviento
Represented By: Gwen Heather Ribar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Marvin Belo Adviento
Represented By: Gwen Heather Ribar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?