Forreststream Holdings Limited v. Shenkman

Plaintiff: Forreststream Holdings Limited
Defendant: Gregory Shenkman
Case Number: 3:2016cv01609
Filed: March 31, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2017 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Beeler denying without prejudice 128 Forreststream's Motion For Assignment of Payments. For the reasons set forth in the attached order, the court denies Forreststream's motion without prejudice to allow a record to be made about assignable payments through discovery and at the judgment debtor exam. The court sets a case-management conference for July 27, 2017, at 11 a.m. to discuss discovery and the judgment debtor exam. If the parties can navigate discovery without the court's intervention, the parties may vacate the July 27 case-management conference by stipulation. The attached order also sets forth a process for Forreststream's renewed motion.(Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 7/16/2017)
March 24, 2017 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 81 Motion for Summary Judgment. There are no genuine disputes of material fact. The court thus grants Forreststream's summary-judgment motion. Mr. Shenkman is personally liable for the loan, and he breached his obligation to pledge shares. The parties must confer and submit a stipulated form of judgment within one week (as discussed more fully in the attached order).(Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
February 15, 2017 97 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Reschedule Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 02/15/2017. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
July 26, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATATED ORDER FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF REGARDING PLEDGE OF EQUITY INTERESTS IN EIS GROUP LTD AND @MOSPHERE, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/26/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forreststream Holdings Limited v. Shenkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forreststream Holdings Limited
Represented By: Roberto J. Kampfner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Shenkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?