Malibu Media, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 108.81.104.254

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 108.81.104.254
Case Number: 3:2016cv01611
Filed: March 31, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Hon. William Alsup granting 19 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Henrik Mosesian Mosesi for Malibu Media, LLC. Attorney Brenna E. Erlbaum terminated.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
July 7, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SEALING MOTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 13 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
June 21, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SEALING MOTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 9 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 108.81.104.254
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Brenna Elsie Erlbaum
Represented By: Brian Morgan Heit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 108.81.104.254
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?