Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Breneman, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California and Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Breneman, Inc. and James G Breneman
Case Number: 3:2016cv01640
Filed: March 31, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2017 79 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of execution issued in the amount of $362,756.06 as to Breneman Inc, and $184,516.52 as to James G. Breneman re 76 Judgment (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017) Modified on 10/31/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF CEMENT MASONS TRUST FUNDS PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/10/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
August 19, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/19/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Breneman, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Susan Jane Olson
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Susan Jane Olson
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Susan Jane Olson
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Susan Jane Olson
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breneman, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G Breneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?