Shareefah Joseph v. Service Employees International Union, United Healthcare West (SEIU UHW)

Plaintiff: Shareefah Joseph
Defendant: Service Employees International Union, United Healthcare West (SEIU UHW)
Case Number: 3:2016cv01644
Filed: March 31, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 Stipulated Request to Extend Deadline for Conducting Mediation; and Proposed Order filed by Service Employees International Union, United Healthcare West (SEIU UHW). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/11/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
August 1, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's 13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/1/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
April 18, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/16/18. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shareefah Joseph v. Service Employees International Union, United Healthcare West (SEIU UHW)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Employees International Union, United Healthcare West (SEIU UHW)
Represented By: Bruce A. Harland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shareefah Joseph
Represented By: Gary Guy Goyette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?