O'Shea et al v. 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kevin O'Shea, Mark Vitcov, Rod Morris and Russell Marchewka
Defendant: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01668
Filed: April 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF JAY EDELSON, ESQ. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/2/17. Show Cause Response due by 2/9/2017. Responses due by 2/16/2017. Replies due by 2/23/2017. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017) Modified on 2/2/2017 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 44 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/19/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
June 8, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING 21 Order to Show Cause RE Pro Hac Vice Application for Rafey S. Balabanian, Esq. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/8/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
May 19, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Rafey Balabanian. Show Cause Response due by 5/26/2016.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/19/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 17, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/17/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 5, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/5/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Shea et al v. 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin O'Shea
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Todd M Logan
Represented By: Eve-Lynn J. Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Vitcov
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Todd M Logan
Represented By: Eve-Lynn J. Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rod Morris
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Todd M Logan
Represented By: Eve-Lynn J. Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Marchewka
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.
Represented By: Terence N. Hawley
Represented By: Rachel Adi Naor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?