Smith et al v. Antioch Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: Michele Smith and M.M.
Defendant: Tobinworld, Antioch Unified School District, Sara Forghani and Andrew Altes
Case Number: 3:2016cv01676
Filed: April 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 141 OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/6/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 136 ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE PLAITNIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF MINOR'S CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/19/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 121 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THE DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS WITNESSES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/8/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Discovery Order.The attached order is the correct order deciding the discovery disputes. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 110 FOR MENTAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF M.M. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/26/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF ESI BY AUSD. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/18/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/25/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE CROSSCLAIM AND THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT AND ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/9/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING 61 DEFENDANT TOBINWORLDS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, FIFTH CLAIM FOR RELIEF. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 49 . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/2/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/6/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Antioch Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tobinworld
Represented By: David Fernando Beach
Represented By: Anne D'Arcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antioch Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Forghani
Represented By: David Fernando Beach
Represented By: Anne D'Arcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Altes
Represented By: Lois Anne Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Smith
Represented By: Peter Wayne Alfert
Represented By: Todd Alexander Boley
Represented By: Maureen Feldman
Represented By: Teresa Li
Represented By: Zoya Yarnykh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M.
Represented By: Peter Wayne Alfert
Represented By: Todd Alexander Boley
Represented By: Maureen Feldman
Represented By: Teresa Li
Represented By: Zoya Yarnykh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?