Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Bennett et al

Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Tamikko Bennett, Jeanton Bennett, Aisha Garrison, Christine Saunders and Express Funeral Funding, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv01698
Filed: April 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL (pursuant to 51 stipulation) by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 21, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL (pursuant to 49 stipulation). (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 8, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING PRIMERICA PURSUANT TO 43 STIPULATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 4, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 40 STIPULATION TO AMEND ANSWER AND DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM by Hon. William Alsup. Amended Answer due by 11/14/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
April 21, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ACCEPT DEPOSIT OF INTERPLEADER FUNDS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/21/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 19, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Hon. Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/19/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 18, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William H. Alsup on 3/17/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Bennett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Ophir Johna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamikko Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanton Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aisha Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Funeral Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?