Giroux v. Essex Property Trust, Inc.

Plaintiff: Angele Giroux
Defendant: Essex Property Trust, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01722
Filed: April 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting In Part 55 Stipulation Re Case Schedule: Designation of Experts due by 11/15/2017; Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 12/15/2017; Motions due by 2/15/2018; Responses due by 3/15/2018; Replies due by 3/29/2018; Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2018 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
May 1, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 43 MOTION TO DISMISS. Amended Pleadings due by 5/26/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
December 1, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART 46 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
September 27, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANT'S 33 MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS 38 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL MATERIALS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
July 18, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2016.; Motion due by 1/9/2017; Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/18/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
June 21, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
June 14, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 19 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
June 10, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice ELIZABETH K. BINGOLD. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giroux v. Essex Property Trust, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angele Giroux
Represented By: Kyann C. Kalin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essex Property Trust, Inc.
Represented By: Martin L. Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?