Guilarte v. Monti et al

Plaintiff: Eduardo Guilarte
Defendant: Andrea Monti, Marriott International Inc. and City of Buenos Aires
Case Number: 3:2016cv01726
Filed: April 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND. Guilarte shall file any Third Amended Complaint no later than February 3, 2017. In said pleading, Guilarte may not include any claim set forth in the Second Amended Complaint that was dismissed in the Court's orders dated January 3, 2017, and November 15, 2016, and may not include any new claim other than the proposed breach of contract claim. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 17, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 3, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT MONTI'S MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. To the extent the motion seeks dismissal of the Second, Third, Fourth and Fifth Causes of Action as alleged against Monti, the motion is granted. To the extent the motion seeks dismissal of the First Cause of Action as alleged against Monti, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 3, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
November 29, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT MONTI'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff's opposition shall be filed no later than December 2, 2016. Monti's reply, if any, shall be filed no later than December 16, 2016. The hearing on the motion is continued from December 16, 2016, to January 6, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 29, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 15, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DISMISSING COMPLAINT TO EXTENT ALLEGED AGAINST MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 15, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
October 6, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 6, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
September 20, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT MONTI TO SERVE NOTICE ON CALIFORNIA ATTORNEY GENERAL; REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT MONTI'S MOTION TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. No later than September 23, 2016, Monti shall file w ith the Clerk of Court, and serve on the California Attorney General, a Notice of Claim of Unconstitutionality with a copy of the motion to dismiss and a copy of this Order attached thereto. Proof of such service shall be filed concurrently therewit h. Guilarte shall file his opposition no later than November 23, 2016. If the State of California wishes to intervene, it shall do so and file its response no later than November 23, 2016. Monti shall file any reply no later than December 2, 2016. Th e hearing on Monti's motion to dismiss is continued from October 21, 2016, to December 16, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. The Case Management Conference is continued from October 7, 2016, to January 20, 2017, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than January 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 20, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
August 2, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The motions to dismiss are granted. If Guilarte wishes to amend, Guilarte shall file a Second Amended Complaint no later than August 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 2, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 27, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 27, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 18, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURTS STANDING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 18, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 1, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued from July 8, 2016, to October 7, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than September 30, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 1, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guilarte v. Monti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Guilarte
Represented By: Amy Sommer Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Monti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Buenos Aires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?