Gonzalez v. Fallanghina, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jose Gonzalez
Defendant: Fallanghina, LLC, Long Branch Berkeley, LLC, Hal Brandel and Walter Wright
Case Number: 3:2016cv01832
Filed: April 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 43 Motion for Settlement. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
July 22, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/22/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
June 28, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTENDING RULE 26(F) REPORT AND CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILING DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/28/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 1, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James finding as moot 18 Motion to Dismiss. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Fallanghina, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fallanghina, LLC
Represented By: Scott Randall Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Branch Berkeley, LLC
Represented By: Scott Randall Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hal Brandel
Represented By: Scott Randall Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Wright
Represented By: Scott Randall Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gonzalez
Represented By: Robert David Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?