Freeman v. Borbeian et al

Plaintiff: Ron Freeman
Defendant: Ed Borbeian and Robert Nichols
Case Number: 3:2016cv01848
Filed: April 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Referring Judge: PSLC AGB
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/18/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
August 31, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge jame on 8/31/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
June 6, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting 6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
June 1, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re 1 Complaint filed by Ron Freeman. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/1/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Borbeian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Borbeian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?