AT&T Corp. v. Teliax, Inc.

Plaintiff: AT&T Corp.
Defendant: Teliax, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01914
Filed: April 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/09/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
February 2, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. This matter is dismissed with prejudice and all hearings are vacated. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/02/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
August 11, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 10 MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 8, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/08/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AT&T Corp. v. Teliax, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Robert B. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teliax, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?