Saperstein v. Dumont Aircraft Sales, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Guy T. Saperstein
Defendant: Dumont Aircraft Sales, LLC and Kevin M. Wargo
Case Number: 3:2016cv01926
Filed: April 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/18/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
August 11, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 10 Motion to Transfer Case. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 8, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Case Management Schedule. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/08/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saperstein v. Dumont Aircraft Sales, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dumont Aircraft Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M. Wargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy T. Saperstein
Represented By: Richard F. Munzinger
Represented By: Roey Rahmil
Represented By: Arthur Joel Shartsis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?