Sullivan v. Finn
Plaintiff: Joanna C Sullivan
Defendant: Stephen A. Finn
Case Number: 3:2016cv01948
Filed: April 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/15/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING IN PART JOANNA SULLIVAN'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING STEPHEN FINN'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 97 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 62 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended complaint by December 28, 2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Pending Motions. Reset Deadlines as to 62 MOTION to Amend/Correct and 67 MOTION to Stay. Motion Hearings continued to 1/4/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/13/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re 64 STIPULATION - Reset Deadlines as to 62 MOTION to Amend/Correct.Response due by 11/28/2016. Reply due by 12/5/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/16/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/22/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ON MOTIONS HEARD ON JULY 6, 2016 by Judge William H. Orrick re: 13 , 29 and 52 Motions. The motions heard on July 6, 2016 are GRANTED to the extent that they seek to strike Finn's cross-complaint. They are DENIED in all other resp ects. A further case management conference is set for September 20, 2016. The Joint Case Management Statement, including the parties proposed trial date and case management schedule, shall be filed by September 13, 2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna C Sullivan
Represented By: Steven James Bleasdell
Represented By: Peter Logan Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen A. Finn
Represented By: Andrew Dale Lanphere
Represented By: Philip S. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?