Castillo et al v. Seagate Technology, LLC

Plaintiff: Everett Castillo, Linda Castillo and Wendy Tran
Defendant: Seagate Technology, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv01958
Filed: April 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 68 to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 6/29/2017 Continued to 7/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/23/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
May 19, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 66 to Continue Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Joint Case Management Conference Statement due 6/22/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/19/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
April 11, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Stay of This Action. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/11/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
March 10, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 to Continue Case Management Conference and Stay of This Action. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for March 16, 2017 Continued to 4/20/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due 4/13/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/10/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
December 27, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTENDING STAY OF LITIGATION BY THREE WEEKS. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 1/5/2017 Continued to 1/26/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/27/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
October 3, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 46 Continuing Plaintiffs' Time to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/3/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
July 6, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 27 Continuing July 21, 2016 Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2016. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 7/21/2016 Continued to 9/8/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/5/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
June 15, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Consolidating Related Actions. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/14/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo et al v. Seagate Technology, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett Castillo
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Represented By: Mark Samuel Greenstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Castillo
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Represented By: Mark Samuel Greenstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Tran
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Represented By: Mark Samuel Greenstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seagate Technology, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?