Garcia v. Midland Credit Management Transunion

Plaintiff: Marta Garcia
Defendant: Midland Credit Management and Transunion
Case Number: 3:2016cv01997
Filed: April 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC ONLY filed by Equifax. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/13/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
July 26, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Of Dismissal With Prejudice Between Plaintiff And Defendant Trans Union, LLC Only filed by Transunion. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/26/16. Copy mailed to Plaintiff(bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
June 10, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 24 Notice of Dismissal as to Midland Credit only filed by Midland Credit Management. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/10/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
May 20, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 , 16 . The parties' stipulation to extend Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc.'s Deadline to Respond to the Complaint to May 23, 2016 is granted. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/20/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Midland Credit Management Transunion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management
Represented By: Jessica Elaine Lanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion
Represented By: Franci Gabrielle Fealk
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?