Fuentes v. Dish Network L.L.C.

Plaintiff: Narciso Fuentes
Defendant: Dish Network L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02001
Filed: April 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PERMITTING SUR-REPLY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/5/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016) Modified on 8/5/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 41 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/21/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/28/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
May 31, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF ADMONISHMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/31/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 6, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 16 STIPULATION to extend briefing schedules on 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and 13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Oppositions due by 5/23/2016. Replies due by 6/8/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 6, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
April 22, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/22/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 18, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/18/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuentes v. Dish Network L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dish Network L.L.C.
Represented By: David Bruce Anderson
Represented By: Ann E. Johnston
Represented By: Richard Ralph Patch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narciso Fuentes
Represented By: Nancy Barron
Represented By: Elliot Jason Conn
Represented By: Bryan Kemnitzer
Represented By: Arthur David Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?