O'Rourke v. Northern California Electrical Workers Pension Plan et al

Plaintiff: John J. O'Rourke
Defendant: Northern California Electrical Workers Pension Plan and Board of Trustees of the Northern California Electrical Workers Pension Trust
Case Number: 3:2016cv02007
Filed: April 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/02/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
December 29, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CROSS 26 , 29 MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - O'Rourke's motion for summary judgment on Claim One is DENIED and the defendants' cross-motion is GRANTED. Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/29/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
December 1, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Stipulation to vacate Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/1/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
August 17, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE -Briefing schedule for cross-motions for summary judgment continued one week. Case Management Conference continued to 12/13/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/17/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Rourke v. Northern California Electrical Workers Pension Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern California Electrical Workers Pension Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Northern California Electrical Workers Pension Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. O'Rourke
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Hasselman
Represented By: Teresa Susan Renaker
Represented By: Kirsten Gibney Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?