Rhom v. Thumbtack, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Rhom
Defendant: Thumbtack, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02008
Filed: April 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 JUDGMENT ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/25/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 43 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND 41 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED 33 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 25 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 14 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to 12 Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhom v. Thumbtack, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thumbtack, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Hugh Blavin
Represented By: Ankur Mandhania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rhom
Represented By: Alexandria R Kachadoorian
Represented By: Justin Kachadoorian
Represented By: Anthony Joshua Orshansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?