Clark v. Hidden Valley Lake Association

Plaintiff: Wayne Clark
Defendant: Hidden Valley Lake Association
Case Number: 3:2016cv02009
Filed: April 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2018 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT WITHOUT POSTING SUPERSEDEAS BOND denying 227 Motion to Stay; finding as moot 239 Stipulation. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 14, 2018 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
February 8, 2018 189 Opinion or Order of the Court <VERDICT FORM (BLANK) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 7, 2018 184 Opinion or Order of the Court <JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 6, 2018 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PUBLIC/PRIVATE FIGURE AND PUBLIC/PRIVATE CONCERN (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
January 19, 2018 159 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
October 31, 2017 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 66 72 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 27, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SPEARS DEPOSITION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
June 1, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 43 Request to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/31/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
August 31, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/31/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Hidden Valley Lake Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Clark
Represented By: Kathleen A. Herdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hidden Valley Lake Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?