Securities and Exchange Commission v. Erik K. Bardman et al

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Erik K. Bardman and Jennifer F. Wolf
Case Number: 3:2016cv02023
Filed: April 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Stipulated Protective Order filed by Erik K. Bardman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 21, 2017. Please note change to paragraph 13. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
April 17, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Rescheduling Case Management Conference filed by Erik K. Bardman. Case Management Statement due by 5/15/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 17, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
February 23, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 42 Amended Complaint Extending Time for Defendant Erik K. Bardman to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Erik K. Bardman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 23, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 8, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 44 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
January 17, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Answer Amended Complaint filed by Jennifer F. Wolf. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 17, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
December 1, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Correcting Title of Amended Complaint and Extending Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Erik K. Bardman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 1, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
October 27, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
October 25, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Rescheduling Case Management Conference filed by Erik K. Bardman. Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 25, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
September 19, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Rescheduling Case Management Conference filed by Erik K. Bardman. Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
May 2, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 7 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Acknowledging Acceptance of Service of Process and Extending Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond, and Setting Briefing Schedule filed by Erik K. Bardman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 2, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Erik K. Bardman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Patrick Reinhold Costello
Represented By: Paul W Kisslinger
Represented By: Kevin C Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik K. Bardman
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer F. Wolf
Represented By: William H. Kimball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?