Electronic Frontier Foundation v. United States Department of Justice

Plaintiff: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 3:2016cv02041
Filed: April 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 47 Defendants Unopposed Administrative Motion for an Extension ofthe Deadline for Filing a Joint Status Report (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
December 2, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Stipulation to Stay Briefing, Vacate Hearing for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2016.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
November 28, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 37 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Reply re 32 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 14, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 35 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
September 29, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Stipulation Regarding Page Limits on Briefs. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
August 2, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 25 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
May 27, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/27/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electronic Frontier Foundation v. United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By: Nathan Daniel Cardozo
Represented By: Aaron David Mackey
Represented By: Mark Thomas Rumold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Julia Alexandra Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?