Axline v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al

Plaintiff: Buz Nay Axline
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and Catholic Healthcare West Long-Term Disability Benefit Plan
Case Number: 3:2016cv02052
Filed: April 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/12/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
December 9, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Order to Show Cause Hearing previously set for 12/15/2016 Continued to 1/19/2017 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 1/13/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/9/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
October 17, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/15/2016 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 12/9/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/17/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
September 14, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Dispositive Motion Briefing Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/14/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
July 25, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. STIPULATION AND ORDER (Docket #25). Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/25/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 11, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/11/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axline v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Healthcare West Long-Term Disability Benefit Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buz Nay Axline
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Hasselman
Represented By: Teresa Susan Renaker
Represented By: Kirsten Gibney Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?