GONZALEZ et al v. MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION et al

Plaintiff: IRIS GONZALEZ, CHARLES BUNCH, ANNE STOM, DAVID WOODWARD, GREG THOMASON, LISA MASSA, DAN CARNEY and MEGAN HUMPHREY
Defendant: MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION and MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02087
Filed: April 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO AMEND; DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE SURREPLY; DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE. Should plaintiffs wish to file an amended pleading for purposes of curing the deficiencies identified within the Court's order, plaintiffs shall file, no later than August 16, 2017, a Third Amended Complaint. The Case Management Conference previously vacated by the Court is hereby RESET for September 1, 2017. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than August 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/01/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
May 2, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS ALLEGED IN SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. The May 5, 2017 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/02/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
April 24, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
March 29, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESCHEDULING APRIL 7, 2017 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES. The April 7, 2017 Case Management Conference is vacated. The Court will issue an order rescheduling the Case Management Conference to a date wi thin two weeks following a ruling on Mazda's pending motion to dismiss, the Court's calendar so permitting. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/29/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017) Modified on 3/29/2017 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR MAZDA DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint no later than March 15, 2017. Defendants shall respond to the Second Amended Complaint on or before March 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/10/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
February 9, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFERRED PORTION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. To the extent plaintiffs were given leave to amend certain of the earlier-dismissed claims, any Second Amended Complaint is due no later than February 23, 2017. The Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled for April 7, 2017. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than March 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/09/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
January 5, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; SETTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE. With respect to the claims as to which the Court has deferred ruling, the Court sets the foll owing briefing schedule: No later than January 20, 2017, plaintiffs shall file a supplemental opposition brief, not to exceed 10 pages in length. No later than January 27, 2017, defendants shall file a supplemental reply brief, not to exceed 7 pages in length. As of January 27, 2017, said matters will stand submitted. To the extent leave to amend is granted, any Second Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than two weeks from the date the Court issues an order on the deferred part of Mazda's motion. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/05/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
September 27, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT SINGLE-SIDED CHAMBERS COPIES OF MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING PAPERS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/27/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 21, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRYAN L. CLOBES PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/21/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
September 7, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE WITH RESPECT TO MOTIONS AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DATES. The 10/28/16 case management conference is continued to 01/13/17 at 10:30 a.m. Any motions in response to th e complaint shall be filed by 09/23/16 and the hearing for any such motion shall be set for 12/2/16 at 9:00 a.m. Responses due by 10/21/16. Replies due by 11/11/16. The parties are ordered to submit all chambers copies in single-sided format. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/07/16. mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
August 3, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 3, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GONZALEZ et al v. MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRIS GONZALEZ
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Represented By: David Christopher Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES BUNCH
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Represented By: David Christopher Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNE STOM
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Represented By: David Christopher Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID WOODWARD
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREG THOMASON
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA MASSA
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Represented By: David Christopher Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAN CARNEY
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Represented By: David Christopher Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGAN HUMPHREY
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Represented By: David Christopher Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?