Oracle America, Inc. et al v. Appleby et al

Plaintiff: Oracle America, Inc. and Oracle International Corporation
Defendant: Bernd Appleby, James Olding, Terix Computer Company, Inc.,, TUSA, Inc., Ermine IP, Inc. and Ermine Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv02090
Filed: April 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle International Corporation. Fact discovery cut-off 6/2/2017. Expert disclosures 7/14/2017. Expert rebut tal 8/11/2017. Expert discovery cut-off 9/15/2017. Deadline to file dispositive motions 9/22/2017. Pretrial conference statement due 12/8/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 1/16/2018 - 2/5/2018 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
September 22, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 57 Motion to Dismiss; denying 58 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
August 29, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle International Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 29, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
July 14, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule filed by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle International Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 14, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
June 30, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Modify Case Management Deadlines filed by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle International Corporation. Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 30, 2016. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 23, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING JUNE 22, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 39 Proposed Order filed by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle International Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 23, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
May 20, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 25 Ex Parte Application Emergency Ex Parte Application of Defendants Bernd Appleby, James Olding, TUSA, Inc., Ermine IP, Inc. and Ermine Services, LLC to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint to June 13, 2016 filed by Ermine Services, LLC, Ermine IP, Inc., James Olding, TUSA, Inc., Bernd Appleby. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 20, 2016. (jstlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oracle America, Inc. et al v. Appleby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oracle America, Inc.
Represented By: Dorian Estelle Daley
Represented By: Thomas S. Hixson
Represented By: Deborah Kay Miller
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Ross
Represented By: Spencer H. Wan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oracle International Corporation
Represented By: Dorian Estelle Daley
Represented By: Thomas S. Hixson
Represented By: Deborah Kay Miller
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Ross
Represented By: Spencer H. Wan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernd Appleby
Represented By: Peter Manfred Bransten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Olding
Represented By: Peter Manfred Bransten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terix Computer Company, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TUSA, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Manfred Bransten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ermine IP, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Manfred Bransten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ermine Services, LLC
Represented By: Peter Manfred Bransten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?