UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. Academy Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: United States of America and Gwen Thrower
Defendant: Academy Mortgage Corporationn
Case Number: 3:2016cv02120
Filed: April 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 137 Relator's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 134 Defendant's Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 126 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 48 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue and 50 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 98 To Reset Hearing Date (Joint) filed by Academy Mortgage Corporation re: 48 Amended MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Utah, 50 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/11/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 60 Government's Motion to Dismiss and Denying as Moot 68 Relator's Request for Evidentiary Hearing. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Postpone Case Management Conference filed by Academy Mortgage Corporationn. CMC reset for 9/20/18 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/20/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Re Request for Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/25/2018. (emcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 85 To Postpone Case Management Conference filed by Academy Mortgage Corporation. Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/27/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 82 TO POSTPONE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Academy Mortgage Corporation. Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2018. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/1/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/8/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 80 and 60 MOTION to Dismiss Relator's Amended Complaint filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/21/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTINGT HEARING ON 60 MOTION to Dismiss Relator's Amended Complaint. Responses due by 9/25/2017. Replies due by 10/2/2017. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/15/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 MOTION to Dismiss Relator's Amended Complaint. Responses due by 9/15/2017. Replies due by 9/22/2017. US's Motion to Dismiss Hearing is reset for 10/5/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/3/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 for Relief From ADR Referral filed by Academy Mortgage Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/11/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO DISMISS/TRANSFER 46 filed by Gwen Thrower. Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/27/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/26/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 vacating 5/4/17 motion hearing and resetting briefing schedule for Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and CMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/5/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 to Extend Time to Respond/Reply to Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Transfer, and Time to Amend Complaint filed by Gwen Thrower, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Ext end Time to Respond/Reply to Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Transfer, and Time to Amend Complaint, 23 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, 27 MOTION to Transfer Case . Motion Hearing reset from 4/27/2017 to 5/4/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/20/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. Academy Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen Thrower
Represented By: Jonathan W Ferris
Represented By: Annette M. Gifford
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Sanford Jay Rosen
Represented By: Van Swearingen
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Academy Mortgage Corporationn
Represented By: Mitchel Howard Kider
Represented By: Thomas Michael McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?