Glass v. U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development

Plaintiff: Leigh Glass
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Case Number: 3:2016cv02142
Filed: April 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND DENYING SANCTIONS MOTION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/24/2017. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
September 23, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 43 Ex Parte Application ; denying 29 Ex Parte Application. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
May 11, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge James Donato. Judge Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/11/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glass v. U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigh Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?