Schneider et al v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Plaintiff: Martin Schneider, Sarah Deigert, Laurie Reese, Tiffanie Zangwill, Theresa Gamage and Nadia Parikka
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02200
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ON ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (This order grants docket no. 181 ).(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 221 Stipulation Setting Dates. Motions due by 4/24/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 205 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. Amended Pleadings due by 2/5/2020 and Motion (Stipulation and Proposed Order) due by 2/7/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER DIRECTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING Re Docket No. 205 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/13/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 201 STIPULATION CONTINUING DEADLINE. Motions due by 9/11/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 197 Stipulation CONTINUING DEADLINE.Motions due by 9/4/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 193 Joint Stipulation to Vacate Dates and Setting Deadline to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement.(hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Ganting 183 Administrative Motion to Specially Set Hearing on Chipotle's 184 Motion to Decertify the Classes. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 186 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 DECISION AND ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. APPROVING IN PART PLAINTIFFS NOTICE ADMINISTRATOR AND AMENDED CLASS NOTICE PLAN Re Docket No. 178 .(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 159 MOTION TO MODIFY CLASS DEFINITIONS.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 154 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 139 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Angela Christine Agrusa for Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. Attorney Sascha Von Mende Henry terminated. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
September 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING Motion for Reconsideration, Dkt. No. 87 ; DENYING Motion for Summary Judgment, Dkt. No. 92 ; GRANTING Motion to Certify Class, Dkt. No. 95 ; and DENYING Daubert Motions, Dkt. Nos. 100 , 101 , 117 .(hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2018)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ON ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. (granting 91 and 98 and granting in part and denying in part 94 and 103 ). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 71 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO EXTEND CLASS CERTIFICATION AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE Re 83 : Motions due by 11/17/2017; Responses due by 12/22/2017; Replies due by 1/19/2018; Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/2/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 77 Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 76 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/13/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS 72 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/23/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding 66 Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 63 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Royval, Adam. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding 60 61 Joint Discovery Letters. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Jacqueline Guesno. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re Kristina Wright. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 45 Revised Joint Proposed Partial Pretrial Schedule : Close of Fact Discovery due by 7/21/2017; Designation of Experts due by 7/28/2017; Rebuttal Reports due by 9/1/2017; Close of Expert Discovery due by 10/6/2017; Mot ions due by 10/20/2017; Responses due by 11/17/2017; Replies due by 12/14/2017; Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2018 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/15/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 43 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S 15 MOTION TO DISMISS. Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2016; Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2016 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Donald R. Hall. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schneider et al v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Schneider
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Donald R Hall
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Deigert
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Donald R Hall
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Reese
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Donald R Hall
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffanie Zangwill
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Donald R Hall
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Gamage
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Donald R Hall
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia Parikka
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Donald R Hall
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Cavanagh
Represented By: Sascha Von Mende Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?