Saberi v. Les Stanford Chevrolet Cadillac Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Andy Saberi
Defendant: Les Stanford Chevrolet Cadillac Inc., Bogdan Dedyk and BJ Interstate Auto Transporter's Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02203
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 17 Motion to Remand. Plaintiff's request for attorney's fees and costs is Denied. Action is REMANDED to Superior Court of California for the County of San Mateo. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/16/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
May 12, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ; anddenying 16 Motion for Order Shortening Time to Hear Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 2, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/2/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saberi v. Les Stanford Chevrolet Cadillac Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Saberi
Represented By: James M. Dombroski
Represented By: James Dombrowski
Represented By: Thomas Issa Saberi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Les Stanford Chevrolet Cadillac Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Crowell
Represented By: David Robert Sidran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bogdan Dedyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJ Interstate Auto Transporter's Inc.
Represented By: James Attridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?